OK SB1090 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Workers' compensation; jurisdiction. Effective date.
Title
Workers' compensation; jurisdiction. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/29/2013 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 19 |
2013-04-22 | House | General Order |
2013-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 9 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed |
2013-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Nelson (principal House author) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to General Government |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bingman |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 365 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 365 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |