OK SB1089 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Coauthored by Senator Murdock
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Highway designations; designating certain highways and bridges. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Highway designations; designating certain highways and bridges. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Murdock
2020-02-20SenateCoauthored by Senator Dahm
2020-02-20SenateRemove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Senator Standridge
2020-02-18SenateTitle stricken
2020-02-18SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed
2020-02-04SenateSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2020-02-03SenateCoauthored by Senator Quinn
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Dahm
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback