OK SB1088 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Banking and Business
Pending: House Banking and Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Banking and Business
Pending: House Banking and Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Unmanned aircraft systems; allowing for certain use and restrictions of use by certain entities. Effective date.
Title
Unmanned aircraft systems; allowing for certain use and restrictions of use by certain entities. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking and Business |
2018-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Ownbey (principal House author) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |