OK SB1087 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1087
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Governmental Tort Claims Act; modifying definition. Effective date.
Title
Governmental Tort Claims Act; modifying definition. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2023-04-10 | House | Title stricken |
2023-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2023-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Howard |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1087 (Carry Over) 2023-04-10 - Enacting clause stricken