OK SB1085 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax; authorizing income tax refund donation for support of Oklahoma General Revenue Fund. Effective date.
Title
Income tax; authorizing income tax refund donation for support of Oklahoma General Revenue Fund. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/21/2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 2 |
2016-04-14 | House | General Order |
2016-03-31 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-03-28 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-03-02 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-03-01 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2016-02-08 | Senate | coauthored by Billy (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |