OK SB1083 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State employees; requiring certain state agencies to provide debriefing and counseling to state employees. Effective date.
Title
State employees; requiring certain state agencies to provide debriefing and counseling to state employees. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-04 | Approved by Governor 05/04/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-30 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-30 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-04-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-25 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-25 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 16 | |
2012-04-25 | General Order | |
2012-04-11 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Billy | |
2012-04-11 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-03-07 | First Reading | |
2012-03-07 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-06 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-06 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Nelson (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Barrington | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |