OK SB1082 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
High-speed transit rail expansion; creating the High-Speed Transit Rail Expansion Commission. Effective date.
Title
High-speed transit rail expansion; creating the High-Speed Transit Rail Expansion Commission. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Nichols (principal House author) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Matthews |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1082&Session=1800 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB1082%20INT.PDF |