OK SB1082 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - coauthored by Mulready (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - coauthored by Mulready (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Construction Industries Board; modifying membership. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Construction Industries Board; modifying membership. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | Senate | coauthored by Mulready (principal House author) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newberry |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |