OK SB108 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB108
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; creating the Death Certificate Accuracy Act; requiring certifier to list certain information. Effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; creating the Death Certificate Accuracy Act; requiring certifier to list certain information. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/06/2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-01 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 12 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-04-22 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 36 |
2019-04-17 | House | General Order |
2019-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-04-03 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 10 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-02-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB108 (Carry Over) 2019-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2019