OK SB1071 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Horse Racing Commission; establishing drug testing on certain horses; requiring scientific evidence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Horse Racing Commission; establishing drug testing on certain horses; requiring scientific evidence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2018-03-15HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-15SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 8
2018-03-14SenateTitle restored
2018-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2018-02-08SenateCoauthored by Representative Renegar (principal House author)
2018-02-08SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-08SenateReported Do Pass as amended Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Allen
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3A20811aAmended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback