OK SB1068 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1068
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - SCs named Howard, Rader, Daniels, Murdock, Stanley, Standridge, Hicks
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - SCs named Howard, Rader, Daniels, Murdock, Stanley, Standridge, Hicks
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax; providing exemption for certain custom order manufacturers. Effective date.
Title
Sales tax; providing exemption for certain custom order manufacturers. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | SCs named Howard, Rader, Daniels, Murdock, Stanley, Standridge, Hicks |
2023-05-09 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2023-05-01 | Senate | HAs read |
2023-05-01 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3 |
2023-04-27 | House | General Order |
2023-04-20 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2023-04-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles |
2023-04-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2023-04-13 | House | Remove Representative Boles as principal House author and substitute with Representative Fetgatter |
2023-04-10 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 4 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Howard |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1068 (Carry Over) 2023-05-11 - SCs named Howard, Rader, Daniels, Murdock, Stanley, Standridge, Hicks