OK SB1065 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' Compensation Commission; modifying membership and selection. Effective date.
Title
Workers' Compensation Commission; modifying membership and selection. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 6 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |