OK SB1065 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
The Anti-Drug Diversion Act; providing for disclosure of certain information to the public. Effective date.
Title
The Anti-Drug Diversion Act; providing for disclosure of certain information to the public. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | Approved by Governor 04/16/2012 | |
2012-04-10 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-10 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-10 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-04-09 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-09 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-09 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-09 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cox | |
2012-04-09 | General Order | |
2012-04-04 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-03-01 | First Reading | |
2012-03-01 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-02-29 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-29 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2012-02-29 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-20 | coauthored by Derby (principal House author) | |
2012-02-20 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Stanislawski | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |