OK SB1062 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; creating A Brotherhood Aiming Toward Education of Oklahoma special license plate; creating revolving fund. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; creating A Brotherhood Aiming Toward Education of Oklahoma special license plate; creating revolving fund. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-05 - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House: Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-05HouseEnacting clause stricken
2016-04-05HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
2016-03-30HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
2016-03-14HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
2016-03-09HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2016-03-01HouseFirst Reading
2016-03-01SenateEngrossed to House
2016-02-29SenateReferred for engrossment
2016-02-29SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
2016-02-29SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2016-02-08Senatecoauthored by Hoskin (principal House author)
2016-02-02SenateTitle stricken
2016-02-02SenateReported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2016-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2016-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Paddack
2016-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
47110428Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4711355New CodeSee Bill Text
522887New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback