OK SB1060 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma State Athletic Commission Act; making certain medical information confidential; regulating entertainment wrestling events. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma State Athletic Commission Act; making certain medical information confidential; regulating entertainment wrestling events. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-26 | House | General Order |
2018-04-11 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman |
2018-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking and Business Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking and Business |
2018-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 3 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Ford (Roger) (principal House author) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Fry |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3A | 604 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3A | 604 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3A | 604 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |