OK SB1060 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; requiring Attorney General to be notified of certain insurance fraud. Emergency.
Title
Insurance; requiring Attorney General to be notified of certain insurance fraud. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brown [R] | Rep. Randon Grau [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Table (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Table (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Approved by Governor 05/01/2012 | |
2012-04-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-25 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-25 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-04-24 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-24 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-24 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 15; Ayes: 68 Nays: 16 | |
2012-04-24 | Amendment restores bill to engrossed version | |
2012-04-24 | Title restored | |
2012-04-24 | Amended | |
2012-04-24 | House Rule suspended | |
2012-04-24 | General Order | |
2012-04-10 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-10 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Public Safety Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-03-14 | First Reading | |
2012-03-14 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-13 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 12 | |
2012-03-13 | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 17 | |
2012-03-13 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Grau (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Brown | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |