OK SB1059 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; modifying revenue apportionment and operational hours of weigh stations. Emergency.
Title
Motor vehicles; modifying revenue apportionment and operational hours of weigh stations. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-27 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 19 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2016-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 19 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2016-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/06/2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-27 | House | To Senate |
2016-05-27 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 7 |
2016-05-27 | House | CCR adopted |
2016-05-26 | House | CCR submitted |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 32 Nays: 14 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 17 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-05-24 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2016-04-27 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2016-04-20 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2016-04-20 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2016-04-14 | Senate | HAs read |
2016-04-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 5 |
2016-04-13 | House | General Order |
2016-04-05 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2016-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-03-30 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2016-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 1 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Osborn (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |