OK SB1055 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB1055

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: House General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Open Meeting Act; providing exception for certain quorum requirements for community action agency boards. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Open Meeting Act; providing exception for certain quorum requirements for community action agency boards. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-29HouseSecond Reading referred to General Government
2023-03-22HouseFirst Reading
2023-03-22SenateEngrossed to House
2023-03-21SenateReferred for engrossment
2023-03-21SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2023-03-21SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2023-02-28SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
2023-02-16SenateCoauthored by Representative Pae (principal House author)
2023-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2023-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Kidd
2023-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB1055 (Carry Over) 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to General Government

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1055&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/SB/SB1055%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB1055%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/SB1055%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/SB/SB1055%20ENGR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB1055%20PCS.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB1055%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB1055%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB1055_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback