OK SB1050 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-29 - coauthored by Mazzei
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-29 - coauthored by Mazzei
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle taxes and fees; modifying apportionment after certain date; providing for distribution in excess of certain limit. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicle taxes and fees; modifying apportionment after certain date; providing for distribution in excess of certain limit. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | coauthored by Mazzei |
2016-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Standridge |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smalley |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1050&Session=1600 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB1050%20INT.PDF |