OK SB105 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State Board of Equalization; requiring Board to set fee or schedule of fees charged by county assessor for certain services; outlining basis for determining fees; providing for deposit and expenditure of funds. Effective date.
Title
State Board of Equalization; requiring Board to set fee or schedule of fees charged by county assessor for certain services; outlining basis for determining fees; providing for deposit and expenditure of funds. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Justice [R] | Rep. Leslie Osborn [R] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - House - House: (Y: 75 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 55 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 55 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Approved by Governor 05/26/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-19 | To Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 19 | |
2011-05-19 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-17 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-17 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-17 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-13 | Title restored | |
2011-05-13 | CCR read | |
2011-04-27 | Conference granted, naming: GCCA | |
2011-04-27 | SCs named Justice, Mazzei, Marlatt, Newberry, Burrage, Ivester | |
2011-04-25 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2011-04-25 | HAs read | |
2011-04-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-20 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 39 | |
2011-04-20 | Amended | |
2011-04-20 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Tibbs | |
2011-04-20 | General Order | |
2011-04-07 | Title restored | |
2011-04-07 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-02-28 | First Reading | |
2011-02-28 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-02-24 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-02-24 | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 16 | |
2011-02-24 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-02-15 | coauthored by Osborn (principal House author) | |
2011-02-15 | Title stricken | |
2011-02-15 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Justice | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 2839 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 2864 | New Code | See Bill Text |