OK SB1042 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Solid Waste Management; recycling roofing shingles. Emergency.
Title
Solid Waste Management; recycling roofing shingles. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Approved by Governor 05/07/2012 | |
2012-05-01 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-01 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-01 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-04-30 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-30 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Scott | |
2012-04-26 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 6 | |
2012-04-26 | General Order | |
2012-04-05 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-22 | First Reading | |
2012-02-22 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-02-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-21 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-02-21 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-14 | coauthored by Wright (principal House author) | |
2012-02-14 | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Energy | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Justice | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |