OK SB1040 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Child support orders; clarifying certain jurisdiction. Effective date.
Title
Child support orders; clarifying certain jurisdiction. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 1 |
2013-04-22 | House | General Order |
2013-04-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman |
2013-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Human Services |
2013-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2013-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sykes |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |