OK SB1040 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Grand River Dam Authority; authorizing certain directors to serve at the pleasure of the appointing authorities. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grand River Dam Authority; authorizing certain directors to serve at the pleasure of the appointing authorities. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-25 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - House: Conference Committee on Natural Resources: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-25 CCR submitted
2012-05-25 Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2012-05-25 Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2012-05-25 CCR adopted
2012-05-24 Title restored
2012-05-24 Remove as author Senator Marlatt; authored by Senator Wyrick
2012-05-24 CCR read
2012-05-15 Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Natural Resources
2012-05-14 SCs named Marlatt, Branan, Crain, Schulz, Burrage, Paddack
2012-05-09 HAs rejected, conference requested
2012-04-30 HAs read
2012-04-26 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-04-25 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-25 Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
2012-04-25 Amended
2012-04-25 House Rule suspended
2012-04-25 Title stricken
2012-04-25 Amended
2012-04-25 Coauthored by Representative(s) Cannaday, Cockroft
2012-04-25 General Order
2012-03-28 Title restored
2012-03-28 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee
2012-03-21 Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment
2012-03-19 First Reading
2012-03-19 Engrossed to House
2012-03-15 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-15 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0
2012-03-15 coauthored by Fields
2012-03-15 General Order, Considered
2012-02-27 coauthored by Armes (principal House author)
2012-02-27 Title stricken
2012-02-27 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed
2012-02-14 Referred to Energy
2012-02-14 Withdrawn from Rules committee
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Rules
2012-02-06 Authored by Senator Marlatt
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
821052New CodeSee Bill Text
82108540New CodeSee Bill Text
8210857ANew CodeSee Bill Text
828632New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback