OK SB1038 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1038
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Occupational therapy; modifying certain provisions of the Occupational Therapy Practice Act. Effective date.
Title
Occupational therapy; modifying certain provisions of the Occupational Therapy Practice Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. John Haste [R] | Rep. Mickey Dollens [D] | Rep. Garry Mize [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/14/2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-22 | House | General Order |
2019-04-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Mize |
2019-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-04-03 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Dollens (principal House author) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator David |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Remove as author Senator David; authored by Senator Haste |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1038 (Carry Over) 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019