OK SB1033 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Medical marijuana; construing provision of retail marijuana establishments; Oklahoma Medical Marijuana and Patient Protection Act; grandfathering certain licensed location; allowing license transfer under certain conditions. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical marijuana; construing provision of retail marijuana establishments; Oklahoma Medical Marijuana and Patient Protection Act; grandfathering certain licensed location; allowing license transfer under certain conditions. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 78 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate: RECONSIDER (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 20 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-28SenateApproved by Governor 05/28/2021
2021-05-27SenateSent to Governor
2021-05-27HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2021-05-27SenateEnrolled, to House
2021-05-27SenateReferred for enrollment
2021-05-27HouseTo Senate
2021-05-27HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 12
2021-05-27HouseCCR adopted
2021-05-27HouseCCR submitted
2021-05-27SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 11
2021-05-27SenateConsidered
2021-05-26SenateRemains on Fourth Reading
2021-05-26SenateConsidered and deferred
2021-05-26SenateMotion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 41 Nays: 5
2021-05-26SenateNotice served to reconsider vote on measure Leewright
2021-05-26SenateMeasure failed: Ayes: 20 Nays: 24
2021-05-26SenateCCR adopted
2021-05-25SenateEmergency added
2021-05-25SenateEnacting clause restored
2021-05-25SenateTitle restored
2021-05-25SenateCCR read
2021-05-06HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
2021-05-04SenateSCs named Leewright, Coleman, Paxton, McCortney, Pugh, Brooks
2021-04-27SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2021-04-22SenateHAs read
2021-04-22HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-04-21HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-04-21HouseThird Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 17; Ayes: 63 Nays: 17
2021-04-21HouseEnacting clause stricken
2021-04-21HouseTitle stricken
2021-04-21HouseAmended
2021-04-21HouseGeneral Order
2021-04-08HouseCR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
2021-03-11HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-11SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-10SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-10SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2021-03-10SenateEmergency added
2021-03-10SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2021-02-08SenateCoauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author)
2021-02-04SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Leewright
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1033&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB1033%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB1033%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB1033%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB1033%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/SB1033%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB1033%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB1033%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/SB/SB1033%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB1033%20PCS.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB1033%20(2-09-21)%20(LEEWRIGHT)%20FA1.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB1033%20(2-19-21)%20(LEEWRIGHT)%20FS%20FA2.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB1033%20(2-09-21)%20(LEEWRIGHT)%20WDFA1.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB1033%20FA1%20OSBURNMI-CC.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB1033%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB1033%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB1033%20FA2%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB1033%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB1033%20CCR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB1033%20CCR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB1033_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB1033_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments 750

feedback