OK SB1030 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

State Medicaid program; directing Oklahoma Health Care Authority to seek certain waiver. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Medicaid program; directing Oklahoma Health Care Authority to seek certain waiver. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2018-03-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-13SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 17
2018-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2018-03-01SenateTitle stricken
2018-03-01SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateCoauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Appr/Sub-Health
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Brecheen
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
56101115Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback