OK SB1027 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Environmental and Natural Resources; providing sunset for Environmental Quality Boards and Councils. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental and Natural Resources; providing sunset for Environmental Quality Boards and Councils. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateApproved by Governor 05/21/2019
2019-05-16SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-16HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-16SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-15SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-15SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 12
2019-05-15SenateHAs adopted
2019-04-04SenateHAs read
2019-04-04HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-03HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 24
2019-04-03HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader
2019-04-03HouseGeneral Order
2019-03-26HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Administrative Rules
2019-03-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-11SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-07SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-07SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2019-03-07SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-28SenateCoauthored by Representative Gann (principal House author)
2019-02-28SenateReported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed
2019-02-11SenateSecond Reading referred to Energy
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Dahm
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1027&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB1027%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB1027%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB1027%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB1027%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB1027%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB1027%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB1027%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB1027_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB1027_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback