OK SB1024 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1024
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Historical Societies and Associations; repealing the Oklahoma American Civil War Sesquicentennial Commission. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Historical Societies and Associations; repealing the Oklahoma American Civil War Sesquicentennial Commission. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Rep. Denise Hader [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: E DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: E DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/04/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-03 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-02 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader |
2019-04-02 | House | General Order |
2019-03-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules |
2019-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Gann (principal House author) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1024 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2019