OK SB1016 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1016
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; modifying definition relating to underinsured motor vehicle coverage; modifying certain subrogation rights. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; modifying definition relating to underinsured motor vehicle coverage; modifying certain subrogation rights. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Quinn [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Quinn |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1016 (Carry Over) 2019-03-13 - Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author)