OK SB1011 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

State agencies; allowing agencies to place moratorium on pass-through funding. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State agencies; allowing agencies to place moratorium on pass-through funding. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2018-03-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-19SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-15SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-15SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 7
2018-03-15SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2018-03-15SenateCoauthored by Senator Brecheen
2018-03-15SenateRemove as author Senator Brecheen; authored by Senator Daniels
2018-03-07SenateCoauthored by Representative Sears (principal House author)
2018-02-28SenateEmergency clause stricken
2018-02-28SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-28SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Brecheen
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
623442aAmended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback