OK SB101 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Professions and occupations; State Board of Cosmetology and Barbering; modifying reciprocity for foreign country or territory education; Massage Therapy Practice Act; expanding period and qualification to apply for certain license. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professions and occupations; State Board of Cosmetology and Barbering; modifying reciprocity for foreign country or territory education; Massage Therapy Practice Act; expanding period and qualification to apply for certain license. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-17SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 7
2019-05-17SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-16SenateCoauthored by Representative Conley
2019-05-15SenateCCR read
2019-05-14SenateSCs added Scott
2019-05-13SenateRemove as author Senator Smalley; authored by Senator Scott
2019-05-13HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rules
2019-05-07SenateSCs named Smalley, Leewright, Shaw, Pugh, Brooks, Young
2019-05-02SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-05-02SenateRemove as author Senator Bergstrom; authored by Senator Smalley
2019-04-24SenateHAs read
2019-04-24HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-23HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-23HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4
2019-04-23HouseAmended
2019-04-23HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-15HouseEmergency added
2019-04-15HouseRemove Representative Lepak as principal House author and substitute with Representative Ortega
2019-04-15HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules
2019-04-09HouseWithdrawn from Business and Commerce Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2019-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2019-03-11SenateTitle restored
2019-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-03-07SenateCoauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author)
2019-02-14SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-14SenateReported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Bergstrom
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb101&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB101%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB101%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB101%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB101%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB101%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB101%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB101%20CCS.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB101_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB101_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback