OK SB1004 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/11/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/11/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; modifying frequency of dropout report submission to the State Department of Education. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; modifying frequency of dropout report submission to the State Department of Education. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Sharp [R] | Rep. Katie Henke [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/11/2016 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-05 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-04 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 2 |
2016-04-04 | House | General Order |
2016-03-29 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2016-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-08 | Senate | coauthored by Henke (principal House author) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sharp |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |