OK SB1000 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Energy Independence Act; modifying property to which act applies; modifying repayment structure. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Energy Independence Act; modifying property to which act applies; modifying repayment structure. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by Governor 05/13/2019
2019-05-07SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-07HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-07SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-06SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-06SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
2019-05-06SenateHAs adopted
2019-04-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Rader
2019-04-25SenateHAs read
2019-04-25HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-24HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-24HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 5
2019-04-24HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-09HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
2019-03-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-13SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
2019-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-26SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-02-21SenateCoauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author)
2019-02-11SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Leewright
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1000&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB1000%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB1000%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB1000%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB1000%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB1000%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB1000%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB1000%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB1000_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB1000_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback