OK SB1000 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
County purchasing; modifying requirements for county purchasing. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
County purchasing; modifying requirements for county purchasing. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Approved by Governor 04/18/2012 | |
2012-04-12 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-12 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-12 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-04-11 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-11 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-11 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-11 | General Order | |
2012-04-05 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2012-03-07 | First Reading | |
2012-03-07 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-06 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-06 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Johnson (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Stanislawski | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |