OK SB100 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Practice of optometry; revocation of licenses; unprofessional or unethical conduct; providing optometrists may rent areas within retail stores; prescriptions. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Practice of optometry; revocation of licenses; unprofessional or unethical conduct; providing optometrists may rent areas within retail stores; prescriptions. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateApproved by Governor 05/21/2019
2019-05-16SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-16HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-16SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-15SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-15HouseTo Senate
2019-05-15HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
2019-05-15HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-13HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-13SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
2019-05-13SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-09SenateCCR read
2019-05-09Senateremove as coauthor Representative(s) Sneed
2019-05-09Senatecoauthored by Sneed
2019-05-07SenateSCs named David, Leewright, McCortney, Newhouse, Brooks, Young
2019-05-06HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Business and Commerce
2019-05-02SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-04-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Bice
2019-04-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Silk
2019-04-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Thompson
2019-04-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Quinn
2019-04-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2019-04-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Coleman
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Rader
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Leewright
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Kidd
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Murdock
2019-04-24SenateRemove as coauthor Senator Murdock
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Murdock
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Scott
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Jech
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Dugger
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Haste
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Hall
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Pederson
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Pemberton
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Rosino
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Sharp
2019-04-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Standridge
2019-04-23SenateHAs read
2019-04-23HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-22HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-22HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0
2019-04-22HouseAmended
2019-04-22HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-04-22HouseAmended
2019-04-22HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Luttrell
2019-04-22HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-11HouseEmergency removed
2019-04-11HouseTitle restored
2019-04-11HouseRemove Senator Bergstrom as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator David
2019-04-11HouseRemove Representative Martinez as principal House author and substitute with Representative Newton
2019-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-14SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 12
2019-03-13SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-02-21SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-02-21SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-21SenateEmergency added
2019-02-21SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-02-13SenateCoauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Bergstrom
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb100&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB100%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB100%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB100%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB100%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB100%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB100%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB100%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB100%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB100%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB100_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB100_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback