OK SB1 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public finance; creating the Legislative Office of Fiscal Transparency; specifying purpose and duties. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public finance; creating the Legislative Office of Fiscal Transparency; specifying purpose and duties. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House: RECONSIDER EMERGENCY (Y: 0 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 1 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 67 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateApproved by Governor 05/24/2019
2019-05-23SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-23SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-23HouseTo Senate
2019-05-23HouseMotion to reconsider failed: Ayes: 0 Nays: 73
2019-05-23HouseMotion to reconsider bill failed: Ayes: 1 Nays: 80
2019-05-22HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Echols
2019-05-22HouseEmergency passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 18
2019-05-22HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Echols
2019-05-22HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 19
2019-05-22HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-21HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-21SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8
2019-05-21SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-20SenateTitle restored
2019-05-20SenateCCR read
2019-05-17HouseConference granted, HC's named ODonnell, Taylor, Kiger, Kannady, Echols, West (Josh), Pfeiffer, Fugate, Dunnington
2019-05-07SenateSCs named Treat, David, Thompson, Paxton, Floyd, Matthews
2019-05-06SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-04-29SenateHAs read
2019-04-29HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 19
2019-04-25HouseTitle stricken
2019-04-25HouseAmended
2019-04-25HouseRemove as coauthor Representative(s) Gann
2019-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-15HouseWithdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-11SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 10
2019-03-11SenateEmergency clause restored
2019-03-11SenateTitle restored
2019-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-02-27SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-02-27SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-27SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2019-02-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Montgomery
2019-02-04SenateCoauthored by Representative Gann
2019-02-04SenateCoauthored by Representative Lepak
2019-02-04SenateCoauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author)
2019-02-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Allen
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Treat
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB1%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB1%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB1%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB1%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB1%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB1%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB1%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB1_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB1_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback