OK HR1058 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 72-31)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 72-31)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution proclaiming April 6, 2016, as the 20th Annual 4-H Day at the Capitol in Oklahoma.
Title
Resolution proclaiming April 6, 2016, as the 20th Annual 4-H Day at the Capitol in Oklahoma.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
2016-04-06 | House | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2016-04-06 | House | Coauthored by all other Representatives |
2016-04-06 | House | Considered |
2016-04-05 | House | Authored by Representative Enns |
2016-04-05 | House | Introduced |