OK HR1048 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution; March of Dimes March for Change Day; March 9, 2022.
Title
Resolution; March of Dimes March for Change Day; March 9, 2022.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
2022-03-09 | House | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2022-03-09 | House | Considered |
2022-03-08 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) |
2022-03-08 | House | Introduced |