OK HR1044 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 72-31)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 72-31)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Proclaiming March 22, 2016, as General Stafford Day in Oklahoma; distribution.
Title
Proclaiming March 22, 2016, as General Stafford Day in Oklahoma; distribution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
2016-03-22 | House | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2016-03-22 | House | Coauthored by all other Representatives |
2016-03-22 | House | Considered |
2016-03-21 | House | Authored by Representative Wright |
2016-03-21 | House | Introduced |