OK HR1041 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 57-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 57-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution; Rose Day 2022; February 16, 2022.
Title
House Resolution; Rose Day 2022; February 16, 2022.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
2022-02-16 | House | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2022-02-16 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McEntire, Bush, Dills, Moore, Grego, West (Rick), Echols, Sims, Lawson, Fetgatter, Sterling, Manger, West (Josh), Cornwell, Worthen, Boles, Dobrinski, Stark, Russ, Stearman, ODonnell, Johns, Vancuren, Patzkowsky, Luttrell, Strom, Townley, May, Miller, Sneed, Conley, Baker, Lepak, Dempsey, CrosswhiteHader, West (Kevin), Burns, Talley, McCall, Smith, Gann, Wallace, Randleman, McDugle, Hasenbeck, Bashore, Boatman, Ford, Lowe (Dick), Hill, Pae, Stinson, Hardin (David), Olsen, Roe, Frix |
2022-02-16 | House | Considered |
2022-02-14 | House | Authored by Representative West (Tammy) |
2022-02-14 | House | Introduced |