OK HR1034 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 77-28)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 77-28)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution declaring May 1, 2018, as the Second Hispanic Cultural Day in Oklahoma.
Title
A resolution declaring May 1, 2018, as the Second Hispanic Cultural Day in Oklahoma.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
2018-05-01 | House | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2018-05-01 | House | Coauthored by all other Representatives |
2018-05-01 | House | Considered |
2018-04-25 | House | Authored by Representative Martinez |
2018-04-25 | House | Introduced |