OK HR1021 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 72-29)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Observing May 7, 2015, as the National Day of Prayer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Observing May 7, 2015, as the National Day of Prayer.

Sponsors

Rep. Lee Denney [R]Rep. Kevin Calvey [R]Rep. Pam Peterson [R]Rep. Gary Banz [R]
Rep. Lisa Billy [R]Rep. Mike Brown [D]Rep. Ann Coody [R]Rep. Marian Cooksey [R]
Rep. Doug Cox [R]Rep. Jeffrey Hickman [R]Rep. Sally Kern [R]Rep. Jeannie McDaniel [D]
Rep. Jerry McPeak [D]Rep. Richard Morrissette [D]Rep. Raymond Pruett [D]Rep. Wade Rousselot [D]
Rep. Mike Shelton [D]Rep. Ben Sherrer [D]Rep. Jerry Shoemake [D]Rep. Paul Wesselhoft [R]
Rep. Ed Cannaday [D]Rep. David Dank [R]Rep. David Derby [R]Rep. John Enns [R]
Rep. George Faught [R]Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D]Rep. Scott Inman [D]Sen. Rob Johnson [R]
Rep. Charles Joyner [R]Rep. Scott Martin [R]Rep. Mark McCullough [R]Rep. Randy McDaniel [R]
Rep. Jason Murphey [R]Rep. Todd Thomsen [R]Rep. Eric Proctor [D]Rep. Brian Renegar [D]
Rep. Earl Sears [R]Rep. Weldon Watson [R]Rep. Steve Kouplen [D]Rep. Cory Williams [D]
Rep. Leslie Osborn [R]Rep. Pat Ownbey [R]Rep. Charles Ortega [R]Rep. Harold Wright [R]
Rep. Mike Sanders [R]Rep. Seneca Scott [D]Rep. Dan Kirby [R]Rep. Mike Ritze [R]
Rep. Jason Nelson [R]Rep. Mike Christian [R]Rep. Lewis Moore [R]Rep. Todd Russ [R]
Rep. John Bennett [R]Rep. James Lockhart [D]Rep. Donnie Condit [D]Rep. Dustin Roberts [R]
Rep. Josh Cockroft [R]Rep. Tom Newell [R]Rep. Dennis Casey [R]Rep. Sean Roberts [R]
Rep. Steve Vaughan [R]Rep. Emily Virgin [D]Rep. Tommy Hardin [R]Rep. Jadine Nollan [R]
Rep. Glen Mulready [R]Rep. David Brumbaugh [R]Rep. Randon Grau [R]Rep. William Fourkiller [D]
Rep. Elise Hall [R]Rep. Bobby Cleveland [R]Rep. Charles McCall [R]Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R]
Rep. Justin Wood [R]Rep. Scott Biggs [R]Rep. Mark McBride [R]Rep. David Perryman [D]
Rep. Dan Fisher [R]Rep. Ken Walker [R]Rep. Katie Henke [R]Sen. Kevin Matthews [D]
Rep. Jon Echols [R]Rep. Chad Caldwell [R]Rep. Jeff Coody [R]Rep. Travis Dunlap [R]
Rep. Jason Dunnington [D]Rep. Claudia Griffith [D]Rep. John Jordan [R]Rep. Chris Kannady [R]
Sen. James Leewright [R]Rep. Mark Lepak [R]Rep. Ben Loring [D]Sen. John Montgomery [R]
Sen. Casey Murdock [R]Rep. Scooter Park [R]Rep. John Pfeiffer [R]Rep. Michael Rogers [R]
Rep. Shane Stone [D]Rep. Chuck Strohm [R]Rep. Johnny Tadlock [D]Rep. Kevin Wallace [R]
Sen. George Young [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-11HouseEnrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
2015-05-06HouseAdopted, referred for enrollment
2015-05-06HouseCoauthored by all other Representatives
2015-05-06HouseConsidered
2015-04-23HouseAuthored by Representative Denney
2015-04-23HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback