OK HR1017 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR1017
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 76-25)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 76-25)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution proclaiming Wednesday, May 1, 2019, to be the third Hispanic Cultural Day in Oklahoma.
Title
A Resolution proclaiming Wednesday, May 1, 2019, to be the third Hispanic Cultural Day in Oklahoma.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
2019-05-01 | House | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2019-05-01 | House | Coauthored by all other Representatives |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered |
2019-04-22 | House | Authored by Representative Stone |
2019-04-22 | House | Introduced |
Same As/Similar To
HR1017 (Carry Over) 2019-05-02 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State