OK HJR1122 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the State Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision; distribution.
Title
Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the State Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision; distribution.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. George Faught [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Approved by Governor 05/30/2012 | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-24 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-24 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-24 | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-24 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-05-15 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2012-05-08 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2012-05-07 | First Reading | |
2012-05-07 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-05-03 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 1 | |
2012-05-03 | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) | |
2012-05-03 | General Order | |
2012-04-25 | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules and Government Oversight Committee | |
2012-04-17 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight | |
2012-04-16 | Authored by Representative Faught | |
2012-04-16 | First Reading |