OK HJR1111 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/22/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/22/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the Oklahoma State Board of Examiners for Long-Term Care Administrators; distribution.
Title
Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the Oklahoma State Board of Examiners for Long-Term Care Administrators; distribution.
Sponsors
Rep. David Dank [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by Governor 05/22/2012 | |
2012-05-17 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-17 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-17 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-16 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-16 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-16 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-05-15 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2012-05-07 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2012-05-01 | First Reading | |
2012-05-01 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-30 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-30 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1 | |
2012-04-30 | General Order | |
2012-04-25 | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules and Government Oversight Committee | |
2012-04-03 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight | |
2012-04-02 | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) | |
2012-04-02 | Authored by Representative Dank | |
2012-04-02 | First Reading |