OK HJR1054 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Veto override failed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Veto override failed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; providing that participation in certain health care systems shall not be compulsory; prohibiting fines; authorizing employment of legal counsel.
Title
Insurance; providing that participation in certain health care systems shall not be compulsory; prohibiting fines; authorizing employment of legal counsel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-18 - House - House: N (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - House - House: (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 34 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2010-04-28 - House - House: C (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - House: TABLE ADV (Y: 33 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - House - House: (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 34 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2010-04-28 - House - House: C (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - House: TABLE ADV (Y: 33 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-21 | Veto override failed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 16 | |
2010-05-18 | Veto message read | |
2010-05-18 | To Senate | |
2010-05-18 | Veto overridden: Ayes: 72 Nays: 24 | |
2010-05-17 | Vetoed 05/14/2010 | |
2010-05-11 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-11 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-11 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-10 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-10 | Measure sent to House | |
2010-05-10 | Motion expired | |
2010-05-04 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Jolley | |
2010-05-04 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 17 | |
2010-05-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 17 | |
2010-05-04 | Ayes: 25 Nays: 17 | |
2010-05-04 | CCR adopted | |
2010-04-29 | CCR read | |
2010-04-29 | To Senate | |
2010-04-29 | Motion to reconsider tabled | |
2010-04-28 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Ritze | |
2010-04-28 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 19 | |
2010-04-28 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Derby | |
2010-04-28 | Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 27 | |
2010-04-28 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Coody, Derby, Wesselhoft, McDaniel (Randy), Sullivan, Wright (John), Duncan | |
2010-04-28 | Ayes: 71 Nays: 27 | |
2010-04-28 | CCR adopted | |
2010-04-19 | Emergency added | |
2010-04-19 | Resolving clause restored | |
2010-04-19 | CCR submitted | |
2010-04-08 | HC's named: Ritze, Key, Kern, Reynolds, Duncan, Dorman, Proctor, Faught, Murphey, Ortega, Jackson, Rousselot, Luttrell | |
2010-04-05 | Conference granted, SCs named Brogdon, Coffee, Lamb, Newberry | |
2010-03-31 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-03-24 | SA's received | |
2010-03-24 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-23 | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 11 | |
2010-03-23 | coauthored by Jolley, Aldridge, Stanislawski, Lamb, Ford, Halligan, Bingman, Barrington, Schulz, Johnson (Mike), Reynolds, Branan, Brown, Newberry, Russell, Justice, Coffee, Anderson, Nichols, Coates, Marlatt, Myers, Crain | |
2010-03-23 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-23 | Title restored | |
2010-03-23 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2010-03-23 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-03-22 | Direct to Calendar | |
2010-03-22 | Withdrawn from Health and Human Services committee | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2010-03-15 | First Reading | |
2010-03-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 10 | |
2010-03-11 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-11 | Amended | |
2010-03-11 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Murphey, Moore, Peters, Terrill, Thompson, Martin (Steve), Key, Christian, Faught, Kern, Tibbs, Sanders, Jett | |
2010-03-11 | General Order | |
2010-02-11 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Sykes | |
2010-02-11 | Authored by Senator Brogdon (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-11 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ortega | |
2010-02-11 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Ritze, Reynolds | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 6049 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
ART 19 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |