OK HJR1046 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HJR1046
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/11/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/11/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Approving and disapproving certain proposed permanent rules of state agencies; disapproving certain rules; distribution.
Title
Approving and disapproving certain proposed permanent rules of state agencies; disapproving certain rules; distribution.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Sen. Julie Daniels [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | House | Approved by Governor 06/11/2021 |
2021-05-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-05-26 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-05-26 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2021-05-24 | Senate | coauthored by Roberts (Sean) |
2021-05-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-05-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-05-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-05-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 18 |
2021-05-24 | House | Amended |
2021-05-24 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2021-05-24 | House | General Order |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Authored by Representative Gann |
2021-05-11 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HJR1046 (Carry Over) 2021-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/11/2021