OK HJR1045 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Disapproving permanent rules of the Board of Commercial Pet Breeders; distribution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disapproving permanent rules of the Board of Commercial Pet Breeders; distribution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-16 Approved by Governor 05/16/2011
2011-05-10 Sent to Governor
2011-05-10 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2011-05-10 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2011-05-09 Referred for enrollment
2011-05-09 Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
2011-05-09 Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7
2011-05-09 General Order, Considered
2011-05-02 Direct to Calendar
2011-04-27 First Reading
2011-04-27 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2011-04-26 Referred for engrossment
2011-04-26 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2011-04-26 General Order
2011-04-07 Authored by Senator Wyrick (principal Senate author)
2011-04-07 Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett
2011-04-07 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules and Government Oversight Committee
2011-04-05 Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight
2011-04-04 Authored by Representative Renegar
2011-04-04 First Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback