OK HJR1043 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Article V Convention; authorizing delegation for preconvention gathering and for Article V Convention; filing and distribution.
Title
Article V Convention; authorizing delegation for preconvention gathering and for Article V Convention; filing and distribution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - House - House: V FOURTH READING (Y: 54 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Table (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: V THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Table (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: V THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Filed with Secretary of State |
2018-05-03 | House | Returned by Governor (5/17/2018) |
2018-05-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-30 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-30 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 35 |
2018-04-30 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2018-04-19 | House | SA's received |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 15 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-04-18 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-15 | House | Motion expired |
2018-03-15 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Lepak |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 35 |
2018-03-15 | House | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-15 | House | General Order |
2018-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Lepak |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |