OK HJR1029 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HJR1029
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; authorizing an economically disadvantaged levy for certain school districts; ballot title; filing.
Title
Constitutional amendment; authorizing an economically disadvantaged levy for certain school districts; ballot title; filing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Nichols |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HJR1029 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Second Reading referred to Rules